Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Joseph Thünemann, O.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Keimoes, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Corydala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1898Born
15 Aug 192224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
9 Jul 194041.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Keimoes, South Africa
9 Jul 194041.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrasus
3 Oct 194042.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adrasus
11 Jan 195152.4AppointedBishop of Keimoes, South Africa
12 Sep 196264.1ResignedBishop of Keimoes, South Africa
12 Sep 196264.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Corydala
18 Aug 196567.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Keimoes, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Henry Joseph Thünemann
Bishop Henry Joseph Thünemann O.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Keimoes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalkputs

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast