Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon Klerlein, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bethlehem

Titular Bishop of Voncaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1877BornOberhaslach, France
28 Oct 190326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
24 Mar 192446.5AppointedPrefect of Kroonstad, South Africa
8 Apr 193557.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Voncaria
8 Apr 193557.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kroonstad, South Africa
30 May 193557.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Voncaria
12 Feb 194870.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bethlehem, South Africa
9 Dec 194871.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bethlehem, South Africa
22 May 195072.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bethlehem, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Léon Klerlein:
Bishop Léon Klerlein C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bethlehem

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015