Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Healy

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1841Born
Sep 1867³25.7Ordained PriestPriest of Elphin, Ireland
27 Jun 188442.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland
27 Jun 188442.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Macri
31 Aug 188442.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macri
2 Aug 189654.7SucceededBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
13 Feb 190361.2AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
16 Mar 191876.3DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Healy (VIAF: 83556715)
Archbishop John Healy (born , died ) Archbishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallinafad, Diocese of Elphin
Ordained BishopSligo, Diocese of Elphin
Death PlaceCathedral, Tuam, Archdiocese of Tuam

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 211, and Page 358
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 570
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017