Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Conmy

Deceased

Bishop of Killala, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1843Born
1866²22.8Ordained PriestPriest of Killala, Ireland
25 Jun 189249.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Killala, Ireland
25 Jun 189249.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
24 Aug 189249.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
23 Apr 189350.2SucceededBishop of Killala, Ireland
26 Aug 191168.5DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Conmy
Bishop John Conmy (born , died ) Bishop of Killala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorballa, Diocese of Killala
Ordained BishopSt. Muredach, Cathedral, Ballina, Diocese of Killala

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 90, and Page 285
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017