Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas O’Dea

Deceased

Bishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1858BornCarron
25 Jun 188224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kilfenora, Ireland
16 Jun 190345.4AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
30 Aug 190345.6Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
29 Apr 190951.3AppointedBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
9 Apr 192365.3DiedBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas O’Dea:
Bishop Thomas O’Dea (born , died ) Bishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013