Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Clancy

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1856Born
25 Jun 188225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Elphin, Ireland
12 Jan 189538.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Elphin, Ireland
12 Jan 189538.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Achantus
8 Feb 189538.1SucceededBishop of Elphin, Ireland
24 Mar 189538.2Ordained BishopBishop of Elphin, Ireland
19 Oct 191255.8DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Clancy
Bishop John Joseph Clancy (born , died ) Bishop of Elphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSooey, Diocese of Elphin
Ordained BishopSligo

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 258
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017