Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Higgins

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tuam, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Temnus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1863Born
5 Feb 188824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tuam, Ireland
23 Mar 191248.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tuam, Ireland
23 Mar 191248.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Temnus
16 Jun 191248.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Temnus
22 Apr 191854.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tuam, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael Higgins
Bishop Michael Higgins (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastlebar

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast