Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Coyne

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1854²BornSandfield
1879²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jan 191359.0AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
30 Mar 191359.2Ordained BishopBishop of Elphin, Ireland
17 Jul 192672.5DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Coyne:
Bishop Bernard Coyne (died ) Bishop of Elphin

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013