Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Patrick Gilmartin

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1861Born
1884¹22.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tuam, Ireland
18 Dec 190948.5AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
13 Feb 191048.7Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
10 Jul 191857.1AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
14 Oct 193978.4DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Patrick Gilmartin
Archbishop Thomas Patrick Gilmartin (born , died ) Archbishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRhinsinna, Castlebar

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 133, and Page 378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast