Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Lyster

Deceased

Bishop of Achonry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1850Born
1872¹21.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 188837.3AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
8 Apr 188837.5Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
17 Jan 191160.2DiedBishop of Achonry, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Lyster
Bishop John Lyster (born , died ) Bishop of Achonry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAthlone, Diocese of Elphin
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sligo

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017