Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Austin Dowling

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1868Born
24 Jun 189123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
31 Jan 191243.8AppointedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
25 Apr 191244.0Ordained BishopBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
1 May 191244.0InstalledBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
10 Mar 191950.9AppointedArchbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
25 Mar 191950.9InstalledArchbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
29 Nov 193062.6DiedArchbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Austin Dowling
Archbishop Austin Dowling (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint Paul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast