Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Albert Guertin

Deceased

Bishop of Manchester, New Hampshire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1869BornNashua, NH
17 Dec 189223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
2 Jan 190737.8AppointedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
19 Mar 190738.0Ordained BishopBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
6 Aug 193162.4DiedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA

MicroData Summary for George Albert Guertin:
Bishop George Albert Guertin (born , died ) Bishop of Manchester

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015