Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Stang

Deceased

Bishop of Fall River, Massachusetts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1854BornLangenbrucken, Germany
15 Jun 187824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
12 Mar 190449.9AppointedBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
1 May 190450.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
2 Feb 190752.8DiedBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for William Stang:
Bishop William Stang (born , died ) Bishop of Fall River

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013