Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislaus Vincent Bona

Deceased

Bishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1888Born
1 Nov 191224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
18 Dec 193143.2AppointedBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
25 Feb 193243.3Ordained BishopBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
2 Dec 194456.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
2 Dec 194456.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mela
3 Mar 194556.4SucceededBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
1 Dec 196779.1DiedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Stanislaus Vincent Bona
Bishop Stanislaus Vincent Bona (born , died ) Bishop of Green Bay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jun 2017