Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Fealey Morneau

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA

Titular Bishop of Massa Lubrense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1938 Born
28 May 196627.7Ordained PriestPriest of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
19 Dec 197840.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
19 Dec 197840.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Massa Lubrense
22 Feb 197940.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Massa Lubrense
7 Oct 201375.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Fealey Morneau
Bishop Robert Fealey Morneau (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Green Bay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew London

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Green Bay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018