Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Francis Schmitt

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marquette, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1923Born
22 May 194825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
30 Apr 197047.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
30 Apr 197047.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceanannus Mór
24 Jun 197047.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceanannus Mór
21 Mar 197855.1AppointedBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
8 May 197855.2InstalledBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
6 Oct 199269.6RetiredBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
14 Dec 201188.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Marquette, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Mark Francis Schmitt
Bishop Mark Francis Schmitt (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marquette

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlgoma
Ordained BishopGreen Bay, Diocese of Green Bay, Wisconsin

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 14 Dec 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 532

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast