Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Sebastian Goveas

Bishop of Bettiah, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1955 Born
9 Dec 198328.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bhagalpur, India
22 Jul 201762.4AppointedBishop of Bettiah, India
19 Oct 201762.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bettiah, India

MicroData Summary for Peter Sebastian Goveas
Bishop Peter Sebastian Goveas (born ) Bishop of Bettiah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHosabettu, Hospet, Diocese of Mangalore
Ordained BishopOn the grounds, Cathedral, Bettiah, Diocese of Bettiah

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bettiah.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jul 2017
  • ob/c23: CB, 20 Aug 2017
  • c4: CB, 23 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 19 Oct 2017