Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Patna

Archidioecesis Patnensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • William D’Souza, S.J., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 16 March 1999
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 28,808 (11,127 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bankipore P.O., Patna-800004, Bihar, India
  • Telephone: (0612)673.811
  • Fax: 666.215

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Patna
10 September 1919ErectedDiocese of Patna (erected)
3 August 1956Territory LostDiocese of Patna Prefecture Apostolic of Bhagalpur (erected)
6 March 1980Territory LostDiocese of Patna Diocese of Muzaffarpur (erected)
7 October 1983Territory LostDiocese of Patna Mission "Sui Iuris" of Nepal (erected)
Archdiocese of Patna
16 March 1999ElevatedDiocese of Patna Archdiocese of Patna
12 December 2005Territory LostArchdiocese of Patna Diocese of Buxar (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Patna
195026,83729,462,450.1%1182932884214915ap1951
197047,68151,000,000.1%1710812538117036415ap1971
198057,29347,386,111.1%2613215836217250024ap1981
199059,68814,304,000.4%408412448117443738ap1991
Archdiocese of Patna
199966,11027,255,119.2%529815044017950646ap2000
200067,1532,780,0222.4%5711817538321250646ap2001
200168,49628,356,216.2%6111817938221150646ap2002
200269,86529,490,465.2%6512218737321652646ap2003
200371,26230,080,274.2%6412819237122254246ap2004
200472,68730,681,879.2%5912818738821055546ap2005
200554,12024,709,333.2%571081653283446333bul12Dec2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 31 Jan 2014