Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fulgence Aloysius Tigga

Bishop of Raiganj, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1965 Born
3 Mar 199732.0Ordained PriestPriest of Muzaffarpur, India
27 Jun 199833.3IncardinatedPriest of Bettiah, India
8 Jun 201853.2AppointedBishop of Raiganj, India
28 Aug 201853.4Ordained BishopBishop of Raiganj, India

MicroData Summary for Fulgence Aloysius Tigga
Bishop Fulgence Aloysius Tigga (born ) Bishop of Raiganj

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKatkahi
Ordained BishopOutside, St. Joseph the Worker, Cathedral, Chotparua, Diocese of Raiganj

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Raiganj.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2018
  • ob: CB, 25 Aug 2018
  • c2: CB, 28 Aug 2018
  • c34: CB, 1 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 3 Sep 2018

Quantcast