Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kurien Valiakandathil

Bishop of Bhagalpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1952 Born
28 Oct 197724.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bhagalpur, India
11 Jan 200754.1AppointedBishop of Bhagalpur, India
27 Feb 200754.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bhagalpur, India

MicroData Summary for Kurien Valiakandathil
Bishop Kurien Valiakandathil (born ) Bishop of Bhagalpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElanjy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bhagalpur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,341
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • fn: CB, 19 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast