Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Raipur

Archidioecesis Raipurensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 27 February 2004
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 60,819 (23,491 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Khristbandhu Nivas, Byron Bazar, Raipur-492001, Chhattisgarh, India
  • Telephone: (0771)2423.995
  • Fax: 4052.429

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Raipur
16 January 1964ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Raipur (erected)
23 March 1972Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Raipur Apostolic Exarchate of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)
Diocese of Raipur
5 July 1973ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Raipur Diocese of Raipur
Archdiocese of Raipur
27 February 2004ElevatedDiocese of Raipur Archdiocese of Raipur

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Raipur
197024,1027,800,000.3%131427892231168ap1971
Diocese of Raipur
198032,0937,498,019.4%45236847111622237ap1981
199040,92713,578,294.3%6524894593431256ap1991
199944,12911,821,000.4%91281193703637259ap2000
200043,88911,760,700.4%76341103984633463ap2001
200146,90011,866,000.4%76341104264238061ap2002
200247,48111,546,784.4%96441403395438661ap2003
200347,92111,546,784.4%97461433354938962ap2004
Archdiocese of Raipur
200448,94911,546,784.4%98521503265940163ap2005
201059,99715,553,000.4%89411304615332378ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013