Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Victor Henry Thakur

Archbishop of Raipur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1954 Born
3 May 198429.8Ordained PriestPriest of Muzaffarpur, India
27 Jun 199843.9AppointedBishop of Bettiah, India
11 Nov 199844.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bettiah, India
3 Jul 201359.0AppointedArchbishop of Raipur, India
19 Sep 201359.2InstalledArchbishop of Raipur, India

MicroData Summary for Victor Henry Thakur
Archbishop Victor Henry Thakur (born ) Archbishop of Raipur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChakhni

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Raipur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,447
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2013
  • i: CB, 28 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast