Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gomes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chapecó, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1921BornErechim
21 Dec 194726.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 196140.0AppointedBishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
25 Jun 196140.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
16 Jul 196847.3AppointedBishop of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil
28 Oct 199877.6RetiredBishop of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil
19 Sep 200281.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Gomes:
Bishop José Gomes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chapecó

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Mar 2014