Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guilherme Antônio Werlang, M.S.F.

Bishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1950 Born
22 Feb 197625.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
2 Aug 197928.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
19 May 199948.7AppointedBishop of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil
17 Jul 199948.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil
7 Feb 201867.5AppointedBishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
17 Mar 201867.6InstalledBishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Guilherme Antônio Werlang
Bishop Guilherme Antônio Werlang M.S.F. (born ) Bishop of Lages

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Carlos, Santa Caterina, Diocese of Chapecó, Santa Catarina
Ordained BishopGinásio Municipal de Esportes, São Carlos, Santa Caterina, Diocese of Chapecó, Santa Catarina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lages.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,589
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Feb 2018
  • i: CB, 16 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 17 Feb 2018