Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel João Francisco

Bishop of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1946 Born
8 Dec 197327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil
28 Oct 199852.1AppointedBishop of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil
21 Feb 199952.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil
26 Mar 201467.5AppointedBishop of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manoel João Francisco
Bishop Manoel João Francisco (born ) Bishop of Cornélio Procópio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMachados

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cornélio Procópio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,482
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast