Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventure Akiki, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

Titular Bishop of Larissa in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1905BornNazareth
20 Jul 193025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jun 196762.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
1 Mar 197367.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
1 Mar 197367.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Larissa in Syria
13 May 197368.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Larissa in Syria
197973.7RetiredVicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
9 Sep 198782.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria

MicroData Summary for Bonaventure Akiki:
Bishop Bonaventure Akiki O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013