Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Antônio Cipolini

Bishop of Marília, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1962 Born
15 Aug 198624.1Ordained PriestPriest of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
8 May 201350.8AppointedBishop of Marília, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Jul 201350.9Ordained BishopBishop of Marília, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Antônio Cipolini
Bishop Luiz Antônio Cipolini (born ) Bishop of Marília

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaconde

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Marília.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2013
  • ob: CB, 8 May 2013
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,835

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018