Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Irineu Andreassa, O.F.M.

Bishop of Ituiutaba, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1949 BornIacri
30 Sep 197727.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
16 Dec 197829.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Nov 200959.9AppointedBishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
24 Jan 201060.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
28 Feb 201060.2InstalledBishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
30 Nov 201666.9AppointedBishop of Ituiutaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Irineu Andreassa
Bishop Irineu Andreassa O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Ituiutaba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ituiutaba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,558
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016