Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodolfo Cetoloni, O.F.M.

Bishop of Grosseto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1946 Born
18 Sep 196317.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
19 Sep 197125.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
26 Jun 197327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
25 Mar 200054.2AppointedBishop of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza, Italy
20 May 200054.3Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza, Italy
4 Jun 200054.4InstalledBishop of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza, Italy
28 May 201367.4AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
10 Aug 201367.6InstalledBishop of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo Cetoloni (VIAF: 196138843)
Bishop Rodolfo Cetoloni O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Grosseto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBadia a Ruoti, Diocese of Arezzo
Ordained PriestJerusalem, Patriarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
Ordained BishopSan Romolo, Cathedral, Fiesole, Diocese of Fiesole

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grosseto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,768
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc/i: AM, 14 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast