Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele Mignone

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1864BornCavatore
14 Jul 188723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Acqui, Italy
29 Apr 190945.1AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
29 Jun 190945.2Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
18 Dec 191955.7AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
23 Dec 196197.7DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Mignone:
Bishop Emanuele Mignone (born , died ) Bishop of Arezzo

  • a priest for 74.4 years
  • a bishop for 52.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 66
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013