Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto José Romero Rivas, O.F.M. Cap.

Vicar Apostolic of Tucupita, Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Nova Sparsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1960 Born
11 Sep 198020.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Mar 199029.9Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Aug 199030.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
7 Apr 201554.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tucupita, Venezuela
7 Apr 201554.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Sparsa
12 Jul 201555.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Sparsa

MicroData Summary for Ernesto José Romero Rivas
Bishop Ernesto José Romero Rivas O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Tucupita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMachiques

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Tucupita.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2015
  • ob: CB, 20 Apr 2015
  • c2: CB, 11 Jun 2015
  • c34: CB, 13 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,545

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast