Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Porter, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bombay, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1825Born
15 Jun 185630.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Dec 188661.3AppointedArchbishop of Bombay, India
27 Feb 188761.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bombay, India
28 Sep 188964.0DiedArchbishop of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary for George Porter (VIAF: 136815510)
Archbishop George Porter S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceExeter
Ordained BishopAllahabad, Diocese of Allahabad

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 152
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,887, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast