Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Filippo Presutti, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Arabia

Titular Bishop of Anchialus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1845BornRecanati, Italy
13 Sep 191065.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen
13 Sep 191065.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Anchialus
30 Nov 191065.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anchialus
3 Aug 191469.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Filippo Presutti:
Bishop Raffaele Filippo Presutti O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Arabia

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 53
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013