Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl (Charles) Reiterer, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kuching, Malaysia

Titular Bishop of Sidyma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1923Born
11 Jul 194825.3Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
9 Feb 196743.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Kuching, Malaysia
9 Feb 196743.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidyma
18 May 196744.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidyma
9 Feb 196844.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Kuching, Malaysia
30 Dec 197451.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Kuching, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Karl (Charles) Reiterer
Bishop Karl (Charles) Reiterer M.H.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kuching

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeltina

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast