Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Caperó Agramunt, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645¹BornCastellón de la Plana
26 Aug 171368.6SelectedBishop of Lugo, Spain
11 Dec 171368.9ConfirmedBishop of Lugo, Spain
8 Apr 171469.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
10 Mar 171974.1DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Caperó Agramunt:
Bishop Andrés Caperó Agramunt O.C.D. (born 1645, died ) Bishop of Lugo

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,487
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 29, Number 76
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015