Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Ochoa Mendarozqueta y Arzamendi

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1658³Born
12 Jul 171759.5AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
21 Sep 171759.6Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
25 Dec 173274.9DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ochoa Mendarozqueta y Arzamendi
Bishop Francisco Ochoa Mendarozqueta y Arzamendi (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMendarózqueta

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,623
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 304
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 35, Number 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast