Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Soto de la Fuente

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1651²BornSevilla
22 Mar 170655.2AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
20 Jun 170655.4Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
29 Dec 171463.9DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Soto de la Fuente:
Bishop Andrés Soto de la Fuente (born 1651, died ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 301
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 25, Number 46
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015