Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio de Lardizabal y Elorza

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1680¹BornGuipúzcoa, Spain
23 Sep 172242.7AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
29 Nov 172242.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
18 Feb 173353.1DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio de Lardizabal y Elorza:
Bishop Juan Antonio de Lardizabal y Elorza (born 1680, died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,597
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 382
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 41, Number 148
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015