Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre-Ignace Galfione, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Seychelles

Titular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1815Born
1838¹22.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1863²47.6AppointedPrefect of Seychelles
31 Aug 188065.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
31 Aug 188065.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Seychelles
19 Sep 188065.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
19 Dec 188166.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Seychelles

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre-Ignace Galfione
Bishop Jean-Pierre-Ignace Galfione O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Seychelles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafranca, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Ordained BishopCapuchins, Church, Chambéry, Archdiocese of Chambéry, France

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 133
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast