Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Hubert de Boccard

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1697³Born
19 Sep 172225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Switzerland
9 Mar 174648.5AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
1 May 174648.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
29 Aug 175860.9DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Hubert de Boccard
Bishop Joseph-Hubert de Boccard (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWippen

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe der Deutschsprachigen Lńnder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1746, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018