Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claude de Rebé

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹BornAmplepuis
27 Apr 162235.3SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Narbonne, France
8 Aug 162235.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Narbonne, France
8 Aug 162235.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
29 Sep 162235.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
8 Feb 162841.1SucceededArchbishop of Narbonne, France
17 Mar 165972.2DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de Rebé:
Archbishop Claude de Rebé (died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 201
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 77, Number 456

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013