Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guido Cardinal Bentivoglio d’Aragona

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1579BornFerrara, Italy
14 May 160727.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
27 May 160727.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
1 Jun 160727.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
24 Oct 161536.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
8 Sep 161636.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
11 Jan 162141.2Elevated to Cardinal
4 Apr 162141.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
17 May 162141.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
11 Jul 162242.7AppointedBishop of Riez, France
26 Oct 162243.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
16 Oct 162546.0ResignedBishop of Riez, France
7 May 163555.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
28 Mar 163959.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
1 Jul 164161.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
7 Sep 164464.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Guido Bentivoglio d’Aragona (VIAF: 20486495)
Guido Cardinal Bentivoglio d’Aragona (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a bishop for 37.2 years
  • a cardinal for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jan 1621
  • c3+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 14, and Page 296
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 44, Number 233
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 12
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016