Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ludovico Cardinal de Torres (II)

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1552²Born
22 Jan 158836.0AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
31 Jan 158836.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
11 Sep 160654.6Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 160654.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
8 Jul 160957.5DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico de Torres (II) (VIAF: 59958930)
Ludovico Cardinal de Torres (II) (born 1552, died ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Lorenzo in Damaso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)San Pancrazio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Most Blessed Sacrament chapel, Cathedral, Monreale, Archdiocese of Monreale

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
  • a cardinal for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Sep 1606
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 250
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 27, Number 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast