Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Focardi Mazzocchi, O.F.M.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Camiri, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Cenculiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1949 Born
8 Dec 197223.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
18 May 197526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
6 Jun 200758.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
6 Jun 200758.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenculiana
2 Sep 200758.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenculiana
15 Jul 200960.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Camiri, Bolivia
2 Aug 201768.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Camiri, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Francisco Focardi Mazzocchi
Bishop Francisco Focardi Mazzocchi O.F.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Camiri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRignano sull'Arno, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Camiri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,499
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Aug 2017