Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ivo Scapolo

Apostolic Nuncio to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Thagaste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1953 Born
4 Jun 197824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
26 Mar 200248.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thagaste
26 Mar 200248.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
12 May 200248.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thagaste
17 Jan 200854.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
15 Jul 201157.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
29 Aug 201966.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Ivo Scapolo
Archbishop Ivo Scapolo (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Portugal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerrassa, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Portugal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,184
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 31 Mar 2020

Quantcast