Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kurian Mathew Vayalunkal

Apostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea

Titular Archbishop of Ratiaria

Apostolic Nuncio to Solomon Islands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1966 Born
26 Dec 199125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India
3 May 201649.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea
3 May 201649.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ratiaria
25 Jul 201649.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ratiaria
21 Sep 201650.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Solomon Islands

MicroData Summary for Kurian Mathew Vayalunkal (VIAF: 215774940)
Archbishop Kurian Mathew Vayalunkal (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Papua New Guinea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVadavathoor
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kottayam, Archeparchy of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Papua New Guinea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 May 2016
  • ob: CB, 14 Jun 2016
  • c2: CB, 19 Jun 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,066

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast