Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Granada en Colombia

Dioecesis Granadiensis in Columbia



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 29 October 1999
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Villavicencio
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 35,000 (13,518 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Carrera 13 N. 23-71, Granada [Meta], Colombia
  • Telephone: (8)658.01.10
  • Fax: 658.00.08

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Ariari
16 January 1964ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Villavicencio Prefecture Apostolic of Ariari (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Ariari
3 October 1987ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ariari Vicariate Apostolic of Ariari
Diocese of Granada en Colombia
29 October 1999ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ariari Diocese of Granada en Colombia
3 July 2004Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Granada en Colombia (from Bogota)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Ariari
196655,00063,00087.3%10105,500347ap1967
196869,70095,00073.4%12125,8081888ap1971
1976110,000120,00091.7%22225,000282414ap1977
1980120,500135,00089.3%126274,462303315ap1981
Vicariate Apostolic of Ariari
1990208,000230,00090.4%817258,320213616ap1991
Diocese of Granada en Colombia
1999192,000207,00092.8%1411257,680152918ap2000
2000188,000202,76092.7%1312257,520163218ap2001
2001193,250202,92095.2%1513286,901173018ap2002
2002194,300210,00092.5%1514296,700193018ap2003
2003150,000172,00087.2%1413275,555193019ap2004
2004150,000200,00075.0%1912314,838183018ap2005
2006151,931205,15174.1%2110314,901113118ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 13 Jun 2012