Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Paolo Tosi

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1714³BornBelvedere
5 Apr 173823.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 175440.2AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
29 Sep 175440.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
31 Mar 180085.7DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo Tosi:
Bishop Pietro Paolo Tosi (born , died ) Bishop of Ferentino

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 214
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015