Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brendan John Cahill

Bishop of Victoria in Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1963 BornCoral Gables, FL
19 May 199026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
23 Apr 201551.4AppointedBishop of Victoria in Texas, USA
29 Jun 201551.5Ordained BishopBishop of Victoria in Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Brendan John Cahill:
Bishop Brendan John Cahill (born ) Bishop of Victoria in Texas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Victoria in Texas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Apr 2015
  • ob: CB, 23 Apr 2015
  • c2+: CB, 12 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,512

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015