Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Fortunato Álvarez Valdéz

Deceased

Bishop of Gómez Palacio, Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1967Born
31 May 199830.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mexicali, Baja California Norte, México
30 Dec 201548.1AppointedBishop of Gómez Palacio, Durango, México
16 Mar 201648.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gómez Palacio, Durango, México
7 Nov 201850.9DiedBishop of Gómez Palacio, Durango, México

MicroData Summary for José Fortunato Álvarez Valdéz
Bishop José Fortunato Álvarez Valdéz (born , died ) Bishop of Gómez Palacio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexicalí, Diocese of Mexicali, Baja California Norte
Ordained BishopAuditorio Centerario de la Expo-Feria, Gómez Palacio, Diocese of Gómez Palacio, Durango
Death PlaceMexicalí, Diocese of Mexicali, Baja California Norte

  • a priest for 20.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 12 Jan 2016
  • c2: CB, 11 Mar 2016
  • c34: CB, 15 Mar 2016
  • c3: CB, 17 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,863
  • d: CB, 7 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 8 Nov 2018

Quantcast